TN SJR1082 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. Jodi Rump, Science and Social Studies Standards Recommendation Committee
Title
A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Dr. Jodi Rump to the standards recommendation committee for science and social studies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR1082&ga=112 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/SJR1082.pdf |