TN SJR1081 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Nisha Powers, Science and Social Studies Standards Recommendation Committee
Title
A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Nisha Powers to the standards recommendation committee for science and social studies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Education Comm. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR1081&ga=112 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/SJR1081.pdf |