TN SJR1004 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Reset on Final cal. 2 of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Reset on Final cal. 2 of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Allison Russell
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and congratulate folk musician and singer-songwriter Allison Russell upon winning her first GRAMMY Award.
Sponsors
Sen. Charlane Oliver [D] | Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
Sen. London Lamar [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Reset on Final cal. 2 of Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2024 |
2024-02-29 | House | Ref. Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-29 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-26 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/29/2024 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/26/2024 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |