TN SJR0966 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Whataburger Day, August 8, 2024
Title
A RESOLUTION commemorating August 8, 2024, as Whataburger Day in Tennessee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0966&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/SJR0966.pdf |