TN SJR0931 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Dr. Andy Holt Highway," U.S. Highway 70A/79 between Humboldt and Milan in Gibson County.
Title
"Dr. Andy Holt Highway," U.S. Highway 70A/79 between Humboldt and Milan in Gibson County.
Sponsors
Sen. Lowe Finney [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-11 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-11 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-07 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-06-04 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-04 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-04 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-06-03 | Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 1 | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar #3 for 6/03/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/04/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-06-02 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 6/2/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/05/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-05-27 | Ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-05-24 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-05-24 | Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-20 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 05/24/2010 | |
2010-05-11 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-05-06 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/11/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Rec. for adoption by S. Trans. Comm. ref to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 05/05/2010 | |
2010-04-08 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans. Comm. | |
2010-04-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-04-07 | Filed for intro. |