TN SJR0923 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the last weekend in October as "Honor Your Hometown Weekend" in Tennessee.
Title
A RESOLUTION to designate the last weekend in October as "Honor Your Hometown Weekend" in Tennessee.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-01 | House | Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2024-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2024-02-29 | House | Ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/26/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |