TN SJR0922 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to Article VI, Section 14 of the Tennessee Constitution to authorize municipal courts to impose civil penalties up to $3,000 for violations of municipal ordinances.
Title
A RESOLUTION to propose an amendment to Article VI, Section 14, of the Constitution of Tennessee, relative to penalties for violations of municipal ordinances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Taken off notice for calendar in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |