TN SJR0816 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Designates January 21-27, 2024, as "Certified Registered Nurse Anesthetists' Week" in Tennessee.
Title
A RESOLUTION designating January 21-27, 2024, as "Certified Registered Nurse Anesthetists' Week" in Tennessee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-02-26 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/14/2024 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 2/14/2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/7/2024 |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |