TN SJR0793 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
William Sullivan, Eagle Scout
Title
William Sullivan, Eagle Scout
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-04 | House | Concurred, Ayes 83, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-04 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for for 4-4-18 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |