TN SJR0714 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Webb Robotics
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and commend Webb School of Knoxville Webb Robotics Team.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-04-20 | House | Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-04-19 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/20/2023 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote |