TN SJR0678 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Tennessee Commission on Aging and Disability to conduct a study on the financial exploitation of vulnerable adults.
Title
Directs the Tennessee Commission on Aging and Disability to conduct a study on the financial exploitation of vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-20 | House | Concurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-04-19 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-04-19 | House | Approved by Delayed Bills Comm. |
2016-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-05 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bill Committee |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/4/2016 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2016 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Judiciary Comm. 3/29/16 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |