TN SJR0649 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Tennessee Division of Forestry, 100th anniversary.
Title
Tennessee Division of Forestry, 100th anniversary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/24/14 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0806) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/17/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | S. Reset on S. Regular Calendar for 3/17/14 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 3/13/2014 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Filed for intro. |