TN SJR0648 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-30 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-30 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes adding a provision establishing right to work regardless of status of affiliation with any labor union or employee organization.
Title
Proposes adding a provision establishing right to work regardless of status of affiliation with any labor union or employee organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 66 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Commerce and Labor Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Commerce and Labor Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-17 | House | Concurred, Ayes 68, Nays 22, PNV 0 |
2020-06-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/20 |
2020-06-16 | House | Reset on cal. for 6/17/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed H. on Second Reading |
2020-06-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/16/20 |
2020-06-15 | House | Reset on cal. for 6/16/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Passed H. on First Reading |
2020-06-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Reset on Constitutional Amendment Calendar |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee |
2020-02-13 | House | Ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 24, Nays 5 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/10/2020 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 2/10/2020 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate on Second Reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/6/2020 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 2/6/2020 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate on first Reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/3/2020 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Commerce and Labor Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 1/28/2020 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 1/21/2020 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |