TN SJR0647 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-12 - Ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-12 - Ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to enact the Medicare Rural Health Access Improvement Act of 2009.
Title
Urges Congress to enact the Medicare Rural Health Access Improvement Act of 2009.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-18 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-18 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-12 | Ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2009-06-18 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-06-18 | Adopted, Ayes 24, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-18 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (2) cal. for 06/18/2009 | |
2009-06-18 | Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-06-18 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/18/2009 | |
2009-06-16 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 6-17-09 | |
2009-06-16 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/16/2009 | |
2009-06-15 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/16/2009 | |
2009-06-15 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/15/2009 | |
2009-06-12 | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. on 06/15/2009 | |
2009-06-12 | P2C, ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2009-06-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-06-09 | Filed for intro. |