TN SJR0571 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
"Youth Art Month" in Tennessee, March 2012
Title
"Youth Art Month" in Tennessee, March 2012
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-02-27 | Ref. to Education Committee | |
2012-02-23 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-02-23 | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2012-02-21 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/23/2012 | |
2012-02-14 | Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-02-10 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/14/2012 | |
2012-02-02 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm. | |
2012-02-01 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-30 | Filed for intro. |