TN SJR0541 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
City of Germantown, TNCPE Excellence Award
Title
City of Germantown, TNCPE Excellence Award
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-02-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-02-12 | House | R/S Concurred, v.v. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 2/12/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |