TN SJR0511 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Kyle Moshier, Eagle Scout

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kyle Moshier, Eagle Scout

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-29SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-29HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-29SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-25SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-23HouseConcurred, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-23HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. 2 for 4/23/19
2019-04-23SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-22SenateAdopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-18SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-17SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-15SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback