TN SJR0491 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses Tennessee's sovereignty over education standards and assessments.
Title
Expresses Tennessee's sovereignty over education standards and assessments.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Ref. to Education Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 27, Nays 3 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/17/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/17/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/13/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Filed for intro. |