TN SJR0410 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Cordia Harrington, lottery corporation board of directors
Title
Cordia Harrington, lottery corporation board of directors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-02-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-02-04 | House | Concurred, Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/1/2016 |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 1/26/2016 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |