TN SJR0392 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Hannah Dove Maurice, Boys and Girls Clubs of the Smoky Mountains Youth of the Year
Title
Hannah Dove Maurice, Boys and Girls Clubs of the Smoky Mountains Youth of the Year
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-05-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-05-04 | House | Concurred, Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2017-05-03 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 5/4/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |