TN SJR0367 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Somali Heritage Month
Title
Somali Heritage Month
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-05-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-05-03 | House | Concurred, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2017-05-01 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 5/3/17 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 5/1/2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |