TN SJR0343 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Ref. to Naming & Designating
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Ref. to Naming & Designating
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Honor the Fallen Month, May 2021
Title
A RESOLUTION to designate May 2021 as "Honor The Fallen Month" in Tennessee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | House | Ref. to Naming & Designating |
2021-04-08 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Committee |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |