TN SJR0239 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Lymphedema Awareness Day," June 18, 2009
Title
"Lymphedema Awareness Day," June 18, 2009
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. CONSENT: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. CONSENT: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2009-04-16 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-04-16 | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-14 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 04/16/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Consent cal. for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-04-06 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm. | |
2009-04-02 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-04-01 | Filed for intro. |