TN SJR0238 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-27 - Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-27 - Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for construction of American Veterans Disabled for Life Memorial in Washington, D.C.
Title
Expresses support for construction of American Veterans Disabled for Life Memorial in Washington, D.C.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-16 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-16 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-27 | Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG | |
2010-01-12 | Ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2009-06-18 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-06-18 | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-18 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/18/2009 | |
2009-06-16 | Rec. for adoption by S. St&L Gov't Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-06-15 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 06/16/2009 | |
2009-06-12 | Ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2009-06-12 | Recalled from S. Ed. Comm. | |
2009-04-06 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2009-04-02 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-04-01 | Filed for intro. |