TN SJR0235 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Shelby Cowman, Nashville's Top 30 Under 30

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Shelby Cowman, Nashville's Top 30 Under 30

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29SenateSigned by Governor.
2017-03-28SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2017-03-28HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-03-28SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-03-28SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2017-03-27HouseConcurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
2017-03-23HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/27/17
2017-03-23SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2017-03-23SenateAdopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2017-03-21SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/23/2017
2017-03-20SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2017-03-16SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-03-14SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback