TN SJR0206 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Confirms the appointment of persons to the University of Tennessee at Martin advisory board.
Title
Confirms the appointment of persons to the University of Tennessee at Martin advisory board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-14 | House | Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/11/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |