TN SJR0181 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Declares that prior authorization requirements from insurance providers should be removed when a healthcare professional provides or seeks to provide medication assisted treatment to a patient with a substance use disorder and declares substance use disorder and opioid use disorder should be insured in the same manner as other diseases such as diabetes and heart disease.
Title
Declares that prior authorization requirements from insurance providers should be removed when a healthcare professional provides or seeks to provide medication assisted treatment to a patient with a substance use disorder and declares substance use disorder and opioid use disorder should be insured in the same manner as other diseases such as diabetes and heart disease.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption with amendment by Senate Commerce and Labor Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption with amendment by Senate Commerce and Labor Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-22 | House | Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee |
2019-04-08 | House | ref. Health Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Approved by Delayed Bills Comm. |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 4/4/2019 |
2019-04-01 | House | Rcvd. from S., ref. to Delayed Bill Committee |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Adopted as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0074) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |