TN SJR0178 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes amendment to remove Article IX, Section 1 of the Constitution of Tennessee, which provides that no minister of the gospel, or priest of any denomination whatever, shall be eligible to a seat in either house of the legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes amendment to remove Article IX, Section 1 of the Constitution of Tennessee, which provides that no minister of the gospel, or priest of any denomination whatever, shall be eligible to a seat in either house of the legislature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-06-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-06-23SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2020-06-17HouseConcurred, Ayes 85, Nays 0, PNV 0
2020-06-16HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/20
2020-06-16HouseReset on cal. for 6/17/2020
2020-06-16HousePassed H. on Second Reading
2020-06-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/16/20
2020-06-15HouseReset on cal. for 6/16/2020
2020-06-15HousePassed H. on First Reading
2020-06-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/15/2020
2020-06-11HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020
2020-06-11HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-06-03HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020
2020-06-03HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-06-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020
2020-06-01HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2020-05-27HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-05-20HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 5/27/2020
2020-03-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020
2020-03-10HouseAction def. in State Committee to 3/17/2020
2020-03-04HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020
2020-03-03HouseMeeting Canceled. Reset on State Committee cal. for 3/10/20
2020-02-26HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/3/2020
2020-02-26HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
2020-02-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 2/26/2020
2020-01-15HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
2020-01-14HouseRef. to State Committee
2019-05-02SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-05-02SenateAdopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/2/2019
2019-05-01SenatePassed Senate on 2nd Reading
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/1/2019
2019-04-30SenatePassed Senate on 1st Reading
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-16SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
2019-03-19SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback