TN SJR0172 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Billy F. Featherstone
Title
Billy F. Featherstone
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Herron [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-04-14 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-04-14 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-04-14 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-04-14 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-04-14 | Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0 | |
2011-04-11 | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/14/11 | |
2011-04-11 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-04-11 | Adopted, Ayes 27, Nays 0 | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 4/11/2011 | |
2011-04-07 | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-04-04 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-04-01 | Filed for intro. |