TN SJR0167 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Harpeth High School Lady Indians, District 11-AA champions
Title
Harpeth High School Lady Indians, District 11-AA champions
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-01 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-03-31 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2009-03-31 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-03-31 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-03-31 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-03-30 | Concurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0 | |
2009-03-26 | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/30/09 | |
2009-03-26 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-03-26 | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (1) cal. for 03/26/2009 | |
2009-03-23 | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-03-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-03-17 | Filed for intro. |