TN SJR0139 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges insurance companies to provide coverage for treatment of lymphedema.
Title
Urges insurance companies to provide coverage for treatment of lymphedema.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-13 | Withdrawn. | |
2009-04-13 | Recalled from S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-03-31 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 4/7/2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/31/2009 | |
2009-03-16 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-03-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-03-10 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0139&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SJR0139.pdf |