TN SJR0121 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-5)
Status: Passed on March 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-5)
Status: Passed on March 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Officer Brenna Hosey, Metro Nashville Police Department
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and commend Officer Brenna Hosey of the Metropolitan Nashville Police Department for her selfless act of heroism.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-03-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-01 | House | Concurred, Ayes 90, Nays 1, PNV 3 |
2021-02-25 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/1/2021 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/25/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |