TN SJR0121 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. Terri Hall, Ms. Tennessee Senior America 2018
Title
Dr. Terri Hall, Ms. Tennessee Senior America 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-02-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-02-11 | House | Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 3 |
2019-02-07 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/11/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/7/2019 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |