TN SJR0119 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Susan Bunch, State Textbook and Instructional Materials Quality Commission
Title
Susan Bunch, State Textbook and Instructional Materials Quality Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/5/2015 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Education Comm. on 3/5/15 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |