TN SJR0099 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Mike and Sara Sellers Memorial Bridge," S.R. 91 in Carter County
Title
"Mike and Sara Sellers Memorial Bridge," S.R. 91 in Carter County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-22 | House | Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | Ref. to Transportation Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/4/2019 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Transportation and Safety Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 1/30/2019 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Transportation & Safety Comm. 1-30-19 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation & Safety Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |