TN SJR0098 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress and the United States Department of Health and Human Services to revise and update the Medicare Wage Index factor.
Title
Urges Congress and the United States Department of Health and Human Services to revise and update the Medicare Wage Index factor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee |
2019-03-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., ref. to Health Committee |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/28/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/19/2019 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |