TN SJR0097 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to Article XI, Section 5 of the Constitution of the State of Tennessee concerning charitable lotteries to authorize the general assembly to authorize the operation of Bingo games to benefit public and private schools.
Title
Proposes an amendment to Article XI, Section 5 of the Constitution of the State of Tennessee concerning charitable lotteries to authorize the general assembly to authorize the operation of Bingo games to benefit public and private schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third and Final Reading (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-01-14 | House | Ref. to State Committee |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 23, Nays 9 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate on second reading |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate on first reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee with a negative recommendation |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/12/2019 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |