TN SJR0081 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-02 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-02 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Designates 2010 as "Tanasi/Tennessee Native American History Year."
Title
Designates 2010 as "Tanasi/Tennessee Native American History Year."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-02 | Withdrawn. | |
2009-03-02 | Recalled from S. S&L Gov. Comm. | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Consent cal. for 03/03/2009 | |
2009-02-23 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm. | |
2009-02-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-18 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0081&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SJR0081.pdf |