TN SJR0076 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-5-1)
Status: Passed on January 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-28 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

American Heart Association/National Wear Red Day, February 1, 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

American Heart Association/National Wear Red Day, February 1, 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-28SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-01-25SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-01-25HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-01-24SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-01-24SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-01-23HouseConcurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 2
2019-01-19HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 1-23-19
2019-01-19SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-01-19SenateRules Suspended, Adopted voice vote
2019-01-19SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-18SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback