TN SJR0072 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5-1)
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5-1)
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. Candice McQueen
Title
Dr. Candice McQueen
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-02-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-01-31 | House | Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 3 |
2019-01-30 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 1/31/2019 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 1/28/2019 |
2019-01-19 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |