TN SJR0065 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
William J. Carver, Tennessee Education Lottery Corporation
Title
William J. Carver, Tennessee Education Lottery Corporation
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-02-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-02-04 | House | Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 1/31/2019 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate State & Local Government Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 1/29/2019 |
2019-01-19 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |