TN SJR0064 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-28 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-28 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Nolan Coffey, Eagle Scout
Title
Nolan Coffey, Eagle Scout
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-01-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-01-19 | House | Concurred, Ayes 84, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 1-19-19 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 1/18/2019 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |