TN SJR0034 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes an amendment to Article II, Section 31 of the Constitution of Tennessee authorizing the governing body or state official charged with carrying out the purpose or objectives of a fund or trust that is administered or invested by the Treasury and that contains state funds, in whole or in part, to adopt, with approval of the Treasurer and the Comptroller of the Treasury, an investment policy to authorize all or part of such fund or trust to be invested such that the state would become an owner, in whole or in part, of any bank or a stockholder with others in any association, company, or corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to propose an amendment to Article II, Section 31 of the Constitution of Tennessee, to allow the investment of state funds in equities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Third and Final Reading (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-06SenateRe-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
2023-04-06SenateFailed to adopt, Ayes 17, Nays 16
2023-04-05SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/6/2023
2023-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/6/2023
2023-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/5/2023
2023-04-03SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/5/2023
2023-03-31SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/3/2023
2023-03-30SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/3/2023
2023-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/30/2023
2023-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/27/2023
2023-03-21SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2023-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023
2023-03-13SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-01-21SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-01-20SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-12SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback