TN SJR0034 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Frederick William Rawlins
Title
Frederick William Rawlins
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-02-16 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-02-16 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-02-16 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-02-16 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-02-16 | Concurred, Ayes 99, Nays 0 | |
2011-02-14 | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/16/11 | |
2011-02-14 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-02-14 | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2011-02-10 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 1 cal. for 2/14/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-28 | Filed for intro. |