TN SJR0014 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Thomas Paine Day," January 29, 2009
Title
"Thomas Paine Day," January 29, 2009
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-03-17 | Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG | |
2009-03-09 | Ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2009-03-05 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-03-05 | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2009-03-03 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 03/05/2009 | |
2009-03-03 | Rec. for adoption, by S. S&L Gov. Comm., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Consent cal. for 03/03/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Action def. in St&L Comm. to 3-3-09 | |
2009-02-24 | Rec for concur by St. &L Comm, ref. to Cal. Comm. | |
2009-02-18 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Consent cal. for 02/24/2009 | |
2009-02-09 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm. | |
2009-01-15 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-14 | Filed for intro. |