TN SJR0010 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the Constitution of Tennessee to provide for the exercise of powers and duties of the governor during disability.
Title
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to Article II and Article III of the Constitution of Tennessee, relative to the exercise of the powers and duties of the Governor during disability.
Sponsors
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONCUR AS AMENDED (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Third and Final Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer to Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONCUR AS AMENDED (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Third and Final Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer to Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0375) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Concurred as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/21 |
2021-04-29 | House | Reset on cal. for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/29/21 |
2021-04-28 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/29/2021 |
2021-04-28 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0375) |
2021-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to Constitutional Amendment 2nd Passage Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2021-03-08 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/4/2021 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/4/2021 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate on 2nd Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/1/2021 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/1/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate on 1st Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/25/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/23/2021 |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/16/2021 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/9/2021 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |