TN SJR0002 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes adding a provision establishing the right to work regardless of status of affiliation with any labor union or employee organization.
Title
A RESOLUTION to propose an amendment to Article XI, of the Constitution of Tennessee, relative to the right to work.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 67 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Third and Final Reading (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Commerce and Labor Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Third and Final Reading (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Commerce and Labor Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-29 | House | Concurred, Ayes 67, Nays 24, PNV 1 |
2021-04-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/29/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Reset on cal. 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | H. subst. & conformed in SJR 2 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 24, Nays 7 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/8/2021 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/8/2021 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate on 2nd Reading |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/4/2021 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/4/2021 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate on First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/1/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Commerce and Labor Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/23/2021 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/16/2021 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/9/2021 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |