TN SJR0001 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to Article II, Section 28 of the Tennessee Constitution to explicitly prohibit any state or local taxation of payroll or earned personal income or any state or local tax measured by payroll or earned personal income.
Title
Proposes an amendment to Article II, Section 28 of the Tennessee Constitution to explicitly prohibit any state or local taxation of payroll or earned personal income or any state or local tax measured by payroll or earned personal income.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 80 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 64 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD AND FINAL READING (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 64 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD AND FINAL READING (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 80, Nays 8 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | H. Read on 3rd Reading |
2013-04-03 | Senate | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2013 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | H. Read on 2nd Reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | H. Read on 1st Reading |
2013-03-21 | Senate | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2013 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 27, Nays 4 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed S. on 3rd Reading |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 27, Nays 3 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Passed S. on 2nd Reading |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/14/2013 |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/13/2013 |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed S. on 1st Reading |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/11/2013 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Rec. for adoption by S. FW&M Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 2/5/2013 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Rec. for pass; ref to S. FW&M Comm Ayes 9, Nays 0 |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 1/29/2013 |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Ref. to S. Jud. Comm. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | P2C Held on desk pending committee appointments |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2012-11-07 | Senate | Filed for intro. |