TN SB8007 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies the manner in which the contraction of COVID-19 is to be treated under the Workers' Compensation Law. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 3; Title 29, Chapter 34; Title 29, Chapter 20; Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1; Title 50; Title 56 and Title 58, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, clarifies the manner in which the contraction of COVID-19 is to be treated under the Workers' Compensation Law. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 3; Title 29, Chapter 34; Title 29, Chapter 20; Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1; Title 50; Title 56 and Title 58, Chapter 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-11SenateFailed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2020-08-11SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 8/11/2020
2020-08-11SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S Commerce & Labor Comm. 8-11-20
2020-08-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2020-08-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-08-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB8008 (Crossfiled) 2020-08-12 - P2C, ref. to COVID Related Liability Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback