TN SB7077 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Lay on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Lay on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, raises from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class E felony knowingly violating an order of protection or a restraining order issued due to domestic abuse when based on stalking; raises the classification range for stalking from a Class A misdemeanor or Class E felony to a Class E or D felony; raises the classification of aggravated stalking from a Class E to a Class D felony; requires a court to order a mental health assessment of a defendant's need for mental health treatment if convicted of a stalking offense, at cost to the defendant unless indigent; requires the sentence to include the defendant undergoing treatment and monitoring of drug intake if the assessment indicates that the defendant is in need of and amenable to treatment. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 39, Chapter 13; Section 39-17-315; Title 40, Chapter 11; Chapter 349 of the Public Acts of 2023 and Chapter 413 of the Public Acts of 2023.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36; Title 39, Chapter 13; Section 39-17-315; Title 40, Chapter 11; Chapter 349 of the Public Acts of 2023 and Chapter 413 of the Public Acts of 2023, relative to stalking.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-22 | Senate | Lay on the Table |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 8/22/2023 |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB7034 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-29 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration